IL HR1269 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Forest Service to allow the use of all-terrain vehicles in Shawnee National Forest. Urges the United States Forest Service to expand the existing system of horse trails and explore additional ways to allow greater recreational use of Shawnee National Forest.
Title
SHAWNEE NATL FOREST-ATV/TRAILS
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. David Reis [R] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-11-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-11-15 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-003-000 |
2016-11-09 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-05-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1269&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR1269.htm |