IL HR1225 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to ensure that the eligibility redeterminations process required by the Save Medicaid Access and Resources Together (SMART) Act be fully operational by October 1, 2012. Requests that the Department provide a monthly briefing to the members of the Legislative Medicaid Advisory Committee regarding the implementation status of all the SMART Act reforms.
Title
DHFS-SMART ACT REDETERMINATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-09-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2012-09-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2012-09-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2012-09-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2012-09-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2012-09-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2012-09-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Kent Gaffney |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-09-17 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2012-09-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2012-09-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2012-09-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-09-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1225&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR1225.htm |