IL HR1091 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the United States Congress and President Donald Trump to pass the Federal Reserve Transparency Act of 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PASS FED TRANSPARENCY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback