IL HR1017 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on November 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes that there are significant disparities in college degree completion rates for low-income and first generation college students and students of color at institutions across the State. Commits to closing statewide racial and socioeconomic degree attainment gaps and institutional achievement gaps and encourages institutions of higher education to implement and expand existing student success efforts that have evidence of improving educational outcomes for low-income and first generation college students and students of color. Urges the State's P20 Council is to update the State's 60 by 25 goal to include equity-focused targets aimed at closing institutional racial and socioeconomic achievement gaps.
Title
COLLEGE COMPLETION RATES
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-11-14 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1017&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR1017.htm |