IL HR0960 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 11, 2018 as the "Annual Alzheimer's Association Advocacy Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
ALZHEIMER'S ADVOCACY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=960&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0960.htm |