IL HR0927 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to pass the Social Security Fairness Act of 2009.
Title
SOCIAL SECURITY FAIRNESS ACT
Sponsors
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] |
Rep. Rosemary Mulligan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2010-04-28 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2010-04-28 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2010-04-28 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2010-04-28 | Resolution Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2010-03-17 | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 004-000-002 | |
2010-03-09 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2010-03-09 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=927&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0927.htm |