IL HR0877 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges congressional representatives to take steps to establish a system of check and balances with regard to the first use of nuclear weapons.
Title
NUCLEAR WEAPONS SYSTEM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=877&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0877.htm |