IL HR0875 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Calls on policymakers at every level of state government to pursue policies that prioritize the expeditious replacement of all remaining lead-based water infrastructure in Illinois. Declares support and encourages municipalities and all other providers of water service to pursue the full range of options for assuring that water infrastructure in Illinois is as safe, modern, and as accessible as possible. Supports plans to provide water in emergency situations.
Title
SAFE WATER INFRASTRUCTURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-17 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=875&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0875.htm |