IL HR0872 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requests that the Department of Revenue conduct an audit to ensure that all adult entertainment facilities subject to the Live Adult Entertainment Facility Surcharge located within the State are complying with current law and the Live Adult Entertainment Facility Surcharge Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADULT ENTERTAINMENT TAX-AUDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback