IL HR0868 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Psychotropic Substances Suicide Risk Task Force within the Department of Public Health.
Title
CREATES-PSYCHOTROPIC TASK FORC
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2010-03-10 | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=868&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0868.htm |