IL HR0864 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-26 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Enbridge and any other pipeline company transporting fossil fuels to have an environmental impact study conducted by a third-party scientific organization with no ties to the industry before they lay any new section of pipe and before any section of existing pipe begins to transport tar sands oil or natural gas extracted by fracking, requires any environmental impact study to include the long-term impact of burning fossil fuels on the looming climate crisis, and requires Enbridge and any other pipeline company to be held fully responsible for any environmental damages caused by leaks or spills or for agricultural damage to the farms through which their pipelines pass.
Title
ENBRIDGE - ENVIRONMENTAL STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-12-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2015-12-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-12-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=864&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0864.htm |