IL HR0842 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 112-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 112-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth the amounts of general funds estimated by the House of Representatives to be available during State fiscal year 2015.
Title
FY15 HOUSE REVENUE ESTIMATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 112-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-02-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 In line by 3PM. Timely filed in accordance with House Rule 18(e). |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |