IL HR0838 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges citizens of Illinois to protect themselves from package theft and delivery companies to implement better package delivery practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BETTER PKG DELIVERY PRACTICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-03-06HouseRecommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2018-02-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback