IL HR0824 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Department of Children and Family Services' response to the tragic deaths of any and all children who have died as a result of the agency's failure to live up to its own mission statement as well as the Department's actions to identify appropriate placement options and avoid further contempt citations.
Title
AUDITOR GENERAL-DCFS
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. David Welter [R] | Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-04-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=824&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0824.htm |