IL HR0816 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares that it is the sense of the House that the Illinois General Assembly must make annual contributions to the Chicago Teachers' Pension Fund in an amount equal to 20-30% of the amount of the annual State contribution to the Teachers' Retirement System of Illinois.
Title
CHGO TEACHER PENSION FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-06-30 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2014-05-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2014-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=816&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0816.htm |