IL HR0792 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State of Illinois to support the Illinois War of 1812 Bicentennial Commission and their efforts to recognize the upcoming anniversary.
Title
RECOGNIZE-1812 COMMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2010-06-27 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2010-03-09 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-12-14 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Stephens |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=792&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0792.htm |