IL HR0790 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges that home economics be brought back into high school curriculums with a comprehensive approach covering basic cooking techniques, caloric requirements, sources of food, budget principles, food safety, and effects of food on well-being and risk for chronic disease.
Title
HOME ECONOMICS-HIGH SCHOOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=790&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0790.htm |