IL HR0774 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 1, 2018 as "Lyme Disease Awareness Day" in the State of Illinois.
Title
LYME DISEASE AWARENESS DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-02-13 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-02-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=774&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0774.htm |