IL HR0759 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 8, 2022 as International Women's Day. Reaffirms the State's commitment to pursue strategies that guarantee the basic human rights of women and girls, to promote meaningful and significant participation of women in all aspects of our society, to encourage equitable access to and healthcare for all women and girls, and to support policy initiatives that seek to achieve gender parity and empower all women.
Title
INTERNATIONAL WOMEN'S DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-03-29 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=759&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0759.htm |