IL HR0755 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly urges the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to delay the implementation of the Health Choice Illinois Medicaid Managed Care Program.
Title
DELAY MEDICAID HLTH CHOICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-01-31 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-003-000 |
2018-01-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-01-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=755&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0755.htm |