IL HR0710 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes "Eating Disorders Awareness Week" as commencing the last Sunday in February.
Title
EATING DISORDER AWARENESS WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-12-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-12-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=710&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0710.htm |