IL HR0689 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-3)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor Bruce Rauner and the members of the Illinois House of Representatives to end any and all State funding of Planned Parenthood immediately. Urges the proper State agencies, including, but not limited to the Illinois Department of Public Health and the Illinois State Police, to conduct a thorough investigation to determine if any Illinois taxpayer dollars are directly involved in the harvesting and selling of baby body parts by Planned Parenthood and associated agencies in Illinois.
Title
PLANNED PARENTHOOD FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2015-09-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2015-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2015-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2015-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-08-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2015-08-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2015-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2015-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2015-08-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=689&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0689.htm |