IL HR0675 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges legislators to support and promote the 2022-2027 Illinois Comprehensive Cancer Control Plan for the benefit of citizens throughout the state.
Title
ILLINOIS CANCER CONTROL PLAN
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Sen. Lakesia Collins [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] |
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-03-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=675&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0675.htm |