IL HR0665 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 14 through April 20, 2024 as Harm Reduction Solidarity Week in the State of Illinois in order to raise awareness about the principles and practices of harm reduction, emphasizing its vital role in public health and safety. Encourages communities to engage in activities that promote education, dialogue, and support for harm reduction initiatives during the week. Recognizes the importance of promoting public health and safety through highlighting proactive measures like harm reduction coupled with recent legislative accomplishments. Acknowledges the dedication and contributions of harm reductionists. Reaffirms commitment to supporting evidence-based harm reduction strategies and to lead with compassion and humanity in place of perpetuating stigma and criminalization in order to greatly reduce substance use-related harm in Illinois.
Title
HARM REDUCTION SOLIDARITY WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-05-03 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-27 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=665&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0665.htm |