IL HR0647 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Acknowledges that toxic stress and adverse childhood experiences can have significantly negative short-term, long-term, and generational impacts and that early interventions through trauma-informed care is the most efficient and cost effective way to combat these impacts. Urges the Illinois State Legislature to seek out opportunities to enhance legislation through the science of resiliency and a trauma informed lens and funding around early intervention services for children and families that centers the principles of brain development, the intimate connection between mental and physical health, and the concepts of toxic stress and adverse childhood experiences.
Title
TOXIC STRESS-CHILDHOOD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2020-02-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |