IL HR0606 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 12, 2024 as "Equal Pay Day". Encourages the citizens of this State to learn about the pay gap that women experience in society and to learn about these various dates that bring attention to the pay gap that specific groups experience.
Title
EQUAL PAY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-04-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-010-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-03-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-03-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-02-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-02-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=606&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0606.htm |