IL HR0595 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes World Suicide Prevention Day, September 10.
Title
RECOGNIZE - SUICIDE PREVENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-26 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-10-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=595&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0595.htm |