IL HR0592 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor Bruce Rauner to declare a state of emergency in Illinois due to the ongoing heroin crisis. Urges the Director of the Department of Public Health, Nirav Shah, to create a comprehensive plan to combat the heroin crisis. Urges the State of Illinois to fully fund the Heroin Crisis Act.
Title
HEROIN - STATE OF EMERGENCY
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-26 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-10-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-09-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-09-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=592&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0592.htm |