IL HR0543 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State Board of Education to delay the implementation of the new Common Core Standards and requests that the State Board of Education and General Assembly work together to create a viable plan to provide funding to school districts that need improvements and modernizations to comply with the new Common Core Standards and the Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Career's.
Title
COMMON CORE STANDARDS - DELAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-06-30 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-03-25 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee |
2014-03-24 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-09-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2013-09-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2013-09-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2013-09-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-09-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-09-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-09-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2013-08-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-08-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-08-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=543&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0543.htm |