IL HR0516 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-9)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares a commitment to ensuring access to quality health care for patients and healthcare consumers in Illinois, urges the Illinois Congressional delegation to support federal legislation to ensure all copays count, and urges the federal regulators to specifically clarify that all copays count in the 2023 Notice of Benefit and Payment Parameters and tri-agency guidance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENSURE ALL COPAYS COUNT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-29HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-10-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2021-10-27HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-10-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2021-10-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2021-10-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2021-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-10-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2021-10-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2021-10-20HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2021-10-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-10-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2021-10-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-10-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-10-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-10-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback