IL HR0491 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares October 15, 2021 as Pregnancy and Infant Loss Awareness Day.
Title
PREGNANCY & INFANT LOSS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-10-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-10-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-10-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=491&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0491.htm |