IL HR0484 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the month of March 2024 as Blood Clot Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLOOD CLOT AWARENESS MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2024-05-02HouseRecommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 008-000-000
2024-03-20HouseAssigned to Public Health Committee
2023-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-10-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback