IL HR0479 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 111-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 111-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of Illinois Route 149 from Monroe Street to McClelland Street in West Frankfort as Bruce Fasol Way.
Title
BRUCE FASOL WAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2015-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-05-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 017-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-25 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Bradley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=479&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0479.htm |