IL HR0473 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the 115th United States Congress to pass House Resolution 38 to allow gun owners to carry their firearms in every state without a permit unless his or her state of residence requires one.
Title
CONGRESS - PASS HR 38
Sponsors
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. David Reis [R] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-06-23 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-06-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-05-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=473&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0473.htm |