IL HR0437 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes the Great Lakes Basin Transportation, Inc. proposed rail line that would run through Indiana, Illinois, and Wisconsin.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GLBT RAILWAY - OPPOSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-06-29HouseResolution Adopted 103-000-000
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-06-28HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-000-000
2017-06-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-06-23HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-23HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-23HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-06-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-05-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback