IL HR0433 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges that violence be labeled as a disease and treated as a public health crisis.
Title
VIOLENCE-HEALTH CRISIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-08-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-08-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-06-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-31 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-31 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Appropriations-Human Services Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=433&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0433.htm |