IL HR0418 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages states to commit to reducing malnutrition through screenings and nutrition treatments.
Title
US - REDUCING MALNUTRITION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-03-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-05-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=418&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0418.htm |