IL HR0412 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the importance of utilizing experienced and highly trained workers for the operation of chemical and nuclear facilities that use, store, and produce radioactive or hazardous substances; condemns the actions of Honeywell International, Inc. with regard to the lockout of experienced workers at the Metropolis Works specialty chemicals facility in Metropolis and calls on Honeywell to promptly end its lockout; condemns the actions of Honeywell International, Inc. with regard to repeated instances of non-compliance with the Resource Conservation and Recovery Act, the Clean Water Act, and the Clean Air Act; and urges the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, the Nuclear Regulatory Commission, and all relevant regulatory bodies to define clear jurisdiction over the Metropolis Works facility, and to conduct comprehensive and ongoing investigations, including full multi-media inspections, to ensure that the facility is operated safely and in compliance with federal regulations.
Title
HONEYWELL-METROPOLIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 064-052-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Labor Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-26 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=412&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0412.htm |