IL HR0395 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 14 through May 20, 2017 as "Food Allergy Awareness Week" in the State of Illinois to help raise awareness and understanding of food allergies.
Title
FOOD ALLERGY AWARENESS WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-06-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Consumer Protection Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=395&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0395.htm |