IL HR0384 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President Trump and Congress to fully fund the programs that will help local law enforcement to address drug trafficking and use in our communities.
Title
FEDS - DRUG PROGRAMS
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Restorative Justice Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=384&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0384.htm |