IL HR0367 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Governor and the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to direct funds that would allow the rebuilding and repair of the Alexander County Housing Development in Cairo.
Title
ALEXANDER CTY AUTHORITY
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-06-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-06-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2017-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-22 | House | Assigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=367&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0367.htm |