IL HR0358 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor Rauner to end the frivolous spending at the Department of Innovation and Technology. Admonishes Secretary Bhatt and urges him to immediately cancel the subscriptions and create a department that is more open and transparent going forward.
Title
DIT - SECRETARY BHATT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-General Services Committee; 006-003-000 |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=358&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0358.htm |