IL HR0343 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 116-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-30 - Resolution Adopted 116-001-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Governor to establish and appoint members to a Commission on the Status of Women to address economic and health care related issues impacting women in the State.
Title
COMMISSION-STATUS OF WOMEN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-30 | Resolution Adopted 116-001-000 | |
2009-05-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-05-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-05-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2009-05-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-05-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2009-05-27 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-05-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-05-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-05-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-05-27 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-05-27 | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-30 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Coulson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=343&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0343.htm |