IL HR0298 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Illinois long-term care facilities to uphold and adhere to federal and state laws, rules, regulations, and guidance on a resident's standards of care, rights, protections, and inalienable right to be treated with respect, dignity, and quality care.
Title
LONG-TERM CARE FACILITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=298&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0298.htm |