IL HR0277 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to adopt a farm bill that supports and promotes the development of local and regional food systems.
Title
URGE CONGRESS - FARM BILL
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-05-11 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-04-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Business Growth & Incentives Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-04-18 | House | Assigned to Business Growth & Incentives Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=277&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0277.htm |