IL HR0255 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges an investment of $1 billion by the State for affordable housing to be included in the next capital budget.
Title
AFFORDABLE HOUSING-INVESTMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Capital Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=255&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0255.htm |