IL HR0245 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Governor, the Department of Transportation, and the General Assembly to maintain the current practice of distributing highway funds with ratio of 45% to northeastern Illinois and 55% to downstate Illinois.
Title
MAINTAIN HWY FUNDS RATIO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Shane Cultra | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Betsy Hannig | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-05-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-04-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-03-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | |
2009-03-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady | |
2009-03-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-03-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-03-30 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=245&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0245.htm |