IL HR0244 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Army Corps of Engineers to seek alternatives to the closure of the Chicago Area Waterway System of locks and canals that would not impede commerce.
Title
URGES-ALTERNATIVE TO CLOSING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2011-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-04-27 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Environment & Energy Committee; 017-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee |
2011-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |