IL HR0241 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress to pass legislation that provides the right to visas for the undocumented parents of U.S. citizen children or DACA eligible children and TPS recipient parents with U.S. citizen children or children brought here before the age of sixteen which allows them and their children to stay and work legally in this country to provide for the economic, physical, and spiritual security and development of those children. Urges the U.S. Congress to pass a clean DACA bill that gives eligible recipients immediate security and a road to citizenship.
Title
DACA LEGISLATION-U.S. CONGRESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-002-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=241&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0241.htm |