IL HR0231 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates the centennial of the United States entering and participating in World War I beginning on March 26, 2017.
Title
COMMEMORATE - WORLD WAR I
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Tabled |
2018-01-31 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2018-01-30 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=231&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0231.htm |